THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:41:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Madurai Kamaraj University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055659100
Fax: 9055658973
Address: 1962 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L0R 1P0
Phone: 9056926060
Fax: 9056927070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Madurai Kamaraj University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055659100
Fax: 9055658973
Address: 1962 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L0R 1P0
Phone: 9056926060
Fax: 9056927070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASEEM MALLECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLECK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASEEM MALLECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLECK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 29, 2011, at the Queen's Bench For Saskatchewan in Swift Current, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Malleck.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 29, 2011, at the Queen's Bench For Saskatchewan in Swift Current, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Malleck.

Training

Medical School: Madurai Kamaraj University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011