THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:02:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2011