THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WESLEY ANDREW BROKENSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROKENSHIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WESLEY ANDREW BROKENSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROKENSHIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2011