THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:37:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 01 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 01 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Psychiatry
DATE: 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011