THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:03:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-348 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993
Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: (905) 997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alsalamah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-348 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993
Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: (905) 997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alsalamah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ABDULLAH S ALSALAMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSALAMAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ABDULLAH S ALSALAMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSALAMAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011