THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Past patients can obtain copies of their files by contacting the Streetsville Glen Medical Centre.
Streetsville Glen Medical Centre, Unit 1B, 7955 Financial Drive, Brampton ON, L6Y 0J8, Phone (905) 455-8877, Fax (905) 455-8867
Date Received: 07 Oct 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.K.Abdel Meguid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Past patients can obtain copies of their files by contacting the Streetsville Glen Medical Centre.
Streetsville Glen Medical Centre, Unit 1B, 7955 Financial Drive, Brampton ON, L6Y 0J8, Phone (905) 455-8877, Fax (905) 455-8867
Date Received: 07 Oct 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.K.Abdel Meguid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2011