THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 03:36:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 30 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto, Ontario, Canada M5T 2Z5
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 30 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto, Ontario, Canada M5T 2Z5
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2011