THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 04:49:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Section of Cardiac Surgery
Foothills Medical Centre
Room C831
1403 29th Street NW
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 944-8443
Fax: (403) 944-2906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ganesh Shanmugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Section of Cardiac Surgery
Foothills Medical Centre
Room C831
1403 29th Street NW
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 944-8443
Fax: (403) 944-2906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ganesh Shanmugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANESH SHANMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANESH SHANMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 May 2011