THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:14:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Victor Benassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Paul V. Benassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Victor Benassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Paul V. Benassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL VICTOR BENASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENASSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL VICTOR BENASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENASSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011