THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean, ON
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Address: BodyStream Clinics
556 Bryne Dr
Unit 16
Barrie Ontario L4N 9P6
Phone: 1-800-730-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean, ON
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Address: BodyStream Clinics
556 Bryne Dr
Unit 16
Barrie Ontario L4N 9P6
Phone: 1-800-730-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNN SHELDRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELDRICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNN SHELDRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELDRICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011