THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:20:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
4th floor
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4th Floor
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
15th Floor Cardinal Carter South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060
Extension: 6560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Div Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
Department of Pediatrics
600 University Avenue, 19th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8297
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
4th floor
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4th Floor
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
15th Floor Cardinal Carter South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060
Extension: 6560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Div Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
Department of Pediatrics
600 University Avenue, 19th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8297
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAKSIM KIRTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRTSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAKSIM KIRTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011