THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Pediatrics
Division of Infectious Diseases
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858299
Fax: 5196858156
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Pediatrics
Division of Infectious Diseases
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858299
Fax: 5196858156
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY NASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY NASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011