THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8T 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-3200
Fax: (519) 258-0245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Laing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8T 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-3200
Fax: (519) 258-0245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Laing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY LYNN LAING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY LYNN LAING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011