THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4000 Highway 7 West
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10088 McLaughlin Road North
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4000 Highway 7 West
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10088 McLaughlin Road North
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILAN SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILAN SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011