THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:03:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Dr
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Medical Center
2nd Floor Medical Clinics
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners - Mississauga Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 813-2744 Ext. 5
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058131100
Extension: 5545
Fax: (905) 813-4536
Address: 181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
30th Floor
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Dr
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Medical Center
2nd Floor Medical Clinics
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners - Mississauga Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 813-2744 Ext. 5
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058131100
Extension: 5545
Fax: (905) 813-4536
Address: 181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
30th Floor
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL WYNN RYCKMAN REBICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL WYNN RYCKMAN REBICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011