THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:41:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Academy St
Presque Isle ME 04769-3171
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2077684000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naderipour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Academy St
Presque Isle ME 04769-3171
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2077684000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naderipour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA NADERIPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADERIPOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA NADERIPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADERIPOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011