THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-901 3rd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 664 9200
Fax: 226 664 9100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-901 3rd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 664 9200
Fax: 226 664 9100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSTIN JONATHAN CURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSTIN JONATHAN CURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011