THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 14:23:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9091
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 5112
Fax: 416-340-3801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9091
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 5112
Fax: 416-340-3801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN MAE AVERSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVERSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN MAE AVERSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVERSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011