THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:20:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thompson Medical Centre
990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Extension: 102
Fax: 519-204-3122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thompson Medical Centre
990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Extension: 102
Fax: 519-204-3122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA MARY DAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA MARY DAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011