THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:05:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-9111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samer Dabbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-9111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samer Dabbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMER DABBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DABBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMER DABBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DABBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011