THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:28:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 King Street
Peterborough Public Health
Sexual Health Clinic
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-748-2021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1600 West Bank Dr
Trent Health Services
Blackburn Hall
Suite 11
Peterborough ON K9L 0G2
Phone: 705-748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055
Address: Peterborough Public Health
185 King St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
Phone: (705)748-2021
Fax: (705)748-3865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 King Street
Peterborough Public Health
Sexual Health Clinic
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-748-2021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1600 West Bank Dr
Trent Health Services
Blackburn Hall
Suite 11
Peterborough ON K9L 0G2
Phone: 705-748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055
Address: Peterborough Public Health
185 King St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
Phone: (705)748-2021
Fax: (705)748-3865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEREDITH KATHRYN WINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINNING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEREDITH KATHRYN WINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINNING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011