THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 05:40:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B5
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Marriage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marriage (CPSO#: 95734 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B5
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Marriage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marriage (CPSO#: 95734 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE MILLS MARRIAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE MILLS MARRIAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011