THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1541 W Broadway
Unit 301
Vancouver British Columbia V6J 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 260-4481
Fax: (604) 325-8577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1541 W Broadway
Unit 301
Vancouver British Columbia V6J 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 260-4481
Fax: (604) 325-8577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAJAM JUNAID MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAJAM JUNAID MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011