THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 00:17:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bruyere Continuing Care
Elisabeth Bruyere Site
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Extension: 4064
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Extension: 75591
Fax: (613) 739-6864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bruyere Continuing Care
Elisabeth Bruyere Site
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Extension: 4064
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Extension: 75591
Fax: (613) 739-6864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY ANNE CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY ANNE CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011