THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1811 Boulevard St-Joseph
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-590-0533
Extension: Ext 1
Fax: 613-590-7351
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1127
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annie Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1811 Boulevard St-Joseph
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-590-0533
Extension: Ext 1
Fax: 613-590-7351
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1127
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annie Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNIE JOANNE LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNIE JOANNE LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011