THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:37:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737-7600
Extension: 1516
Fax: 613 738-4854

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737-7600
Extension: 1516
Fax: 613 738-4854

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA STANISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANISZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA STANISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANISZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011