THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH SARAH KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH SARAH KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011