THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:30:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4141 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest
Suite 625
Westmount Québec H3Z 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-937-3687
Fax: 514-937-0013
Address: 3100 Boulevard Cote Vertu Ouest
Montreal Quebec H4R 2J8
Phone: 514-337-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160 Stillview
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5570 Boul Henri-Bourassa O
225
Saint Laurent QC H4R 0M6
Phone: 514-303-8303
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4141 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest
4141 sherbrooke
Suite 625
Westmount Québec H3Z 1B7
Phone: 5149373687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4141 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest
Suite 625
Westmount Québec H3Z 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-937-3687
Fax: 514-937-0013
Address: 3100 Boulevard Cote Vertu Ouest
Montreal Quebec H4R 2J8
Phone: 514-337-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160 Stillview
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5570 Boul Henri-Bourassa O
225
Saint Laurent QC H4R 0M6
Phone: 514-303-8303
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4141 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest
4141 sherbrooke
Suite 625
Westmount Québec H3Z 1B7
Phone: 5149373687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRO RICARDO ZARRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARRUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRO RICARDO ZARRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARRUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011