THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:47:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Washington
1959 NE Pacific St.
Box 356422
Seattle, Washington
Seattle Washington 98195-6422
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (206) 778-2529
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kareem M. Ballut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Washington
1959 NE Pacific St.
Box 356422
Seattle, Washington
Seattle Washington 98195-6422
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (206) 778-2529
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kareem M. Ballut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREEM M BALLUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREEM M BALLUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011