THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:58:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Extension: 4800
Fax: (905) 845-6419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omotola Adegboyega-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Extension: 4800
Fax: (905) 845-6419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omotola Adegboyega-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOTOLA IBITAYO LAURA ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOTOLA IBITAYO LAURA ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2011