THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:27:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St N, Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-189 Hughson St S
Hamilton ON L8N 2B6
Phone: 905-574-8630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gihan Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perera (CPSO#: 96329 )
Business Address: 414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
(905) 662-3303
Business Address: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St N, Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-189 Hughson St S
Hamilton ON L8N 2B6
Phone: 905-574-8630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gihan Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perera (CPSO#: 96329 )
Business Address: 414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
(905) 662-3303
Business Address: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN CHRISTOPHER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN CHRISTOPHER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011