THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:46:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital
10 Trench St
A100 Tia/Stroke/Neurology Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 7721
Fax: 9058832246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital
10 Trench St
A100 Tia/Stroke/Neurology Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 7721
Fax: 9058832246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURABI R NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURABI R NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011