THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:20:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Washington St
Tufts Medical Center
Department of Surgery, Division of Trauma and Acute Surgery
Box 4488
Boston MA 02111-1552
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Washington St
Tufts Medical Center
Department of Surgery, Division of Trauma and Acute Surgery
Box 4488
Boston MA 02111-1552
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011