THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:12:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-329-1856
Fax: 416-314-4060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-329-1856
Fax: 416-314-4060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA KOCOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCOVSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA KOCOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2011