THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:31:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: King City Medical Associate
20 Doctors Lane, BOX 370
King City Ontario L7B 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058335381
Fax: 9058335649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nilany Somasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: King City Medical Associate
20 Doctors Lane, BOX 370
King City Ontario L7B 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058335381
Fax: 9058335649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nilany Somasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NILANY SOMASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NILANY SOMASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2011