THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE A FATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE A FATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011