THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:16:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cumiskey, Joanna Clare (Used Until: 26 Jul 2011)
Medical School: University of Wales, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: Cumiskey, Joanna Clare (Used Until: 26 Jul 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wales, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOANNA CLARE WALSH may practise medicine independently in Anatomical Pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOANNA CLARE WALSH may practise medicine independently in Anatomical Pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wales, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011