THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:27:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Basque Country, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Basque Country, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Basque Country, 2001
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
22 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
McMaster University
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Aug 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 22 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Aug 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011