THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:28:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 343B Booth St
Ottawa ON K1R 7K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132333030
Fax: 6132331061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 343B Booth St
Ottawa ON K1R 7K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132333030
Fax: 6132331061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTEL TARYN BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTEL TARYN BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011