THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:59:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Eglinton Ave W
York ON M6C 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-406-9362
Fax: 1-877-792-5201

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kasmani (CPSO#: 96896 ) Dr. T. Ghadai (CPSO#: 85821 )
Business Address: 3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0B1
(416) 792-2654
Business Address: 186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1J 5Y2
(905) 576-5181
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Eglinton Ave W
York ON M6C 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-406-9362
Fax: 1-877-792-5201

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kasmani (CPSO#: 96896 ) Dr. T. Ghadai (CPSO#: 85821 )
Business Address: 3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0B1
(416) 792-2654
Business Address: 186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1J 5Y2
(905) 576-5181
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHSEEN SHAKOOR KASMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASMANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHSEEN SHAKOOR KASMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASMANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011