THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:31:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011