THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011