THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:53:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: Toor, Navsheer Gill (Used Until: 04 Jul 2021)
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Health
Schulich Family Medicine Teach Unit
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1008
Fax: 416-242-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navsheer Gill Toor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: Toor, Navsheer Gill (Used Until: 04 Jul 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Health
Schulich Family Medicine Teach Unit
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1008
Fax: 416-242-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navsheer Gill Toor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVSHEER GILL TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVSHEER GILL TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011