THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 06:39:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fudan University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Fudan University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fudan University, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
09 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
01 Nov 2011 to 08 Dec 2011
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 09 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Nov 2011 to 08 Dec 2011
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2011