THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 840-0330
Fax: (416) 840-0333
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 840-0330
Fax: (416) 840-0333
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULTAN OMAR A ALSHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHEIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULTAN OMAR A ALSHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2011