THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles B. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles B. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Apr 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 18 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Charles Benjamin King may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Charles Benjamin King may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Rochester, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011