THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 12:24:27 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2011