THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 18 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 18 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Feb 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 18 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. REZA VALI may practise medicine independently in nuclear medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. REZA VALI may practise medicine independently in nuclear medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2012