THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:56:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Dusk Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 (905) 451-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 8
51 Mountain Ash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: (905) 792-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Dusk Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 (905) 451-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 8
51 Mountain Ash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: (905) 792-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEMINA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEMINA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2011