THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9185
Fax: (519) 255-9152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Tome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9185
Fax: (519) 255-9152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Tome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jun 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 20 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Daniel William Tome may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Daniel William Tome may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2012